Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2109 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2109 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 924 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Record vote | RV#145 | Journal Page: 1096 |
House | 04/05/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1096 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1075 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1075 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 914 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 01/17/2017 | Filed |