Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1073 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2017

                    By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1073
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 20, 2017;
 April 6, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to provisional permits for certain insurance agents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4001.351, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 4001.351.  APPLICABILITY.  This subchapter applies
 only to an applicant for a license as an agent under:
 (1)  Subchapters B and E, Chapter 4051; and
 (2)  Subchapters B, D, [and] E, and G, Chapter 4054.
 SECTION 2.  Section 4001.353(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The department may issue a provisional permit under this
 subchapter on receipt of:
 (1)  a written application for a provisional permit;
 (2)  a properly completed license application,
 nonrefundable fee, and each other item required for a license under
 this chapter and Subchapter B or E, Chapter 4051, or Subchapter B,
 D, [or] E, or G, Chapter 4054, as applicable;
 (3)  the nonrefundable fee in an amount authorized by
 Subsection (c); and
 (4)  a certificate signed by the appointing agent,
 insurer, or health maintenance organization stating that:
 (A)  the applicant completed the training, if any,
 and passed the examination required for the issuance of the license
 for which the application is submitted;
 (B)  the appointing agent, insurer, or health
 maintenance organization completed a background check on the
 applicant that shows that the applicant has not been convicted of:
 (i)  a felony; or
 (ii)  an act that requires the applicant to
 receive written consent under 18 U.S.C. Section 1033 to engage in
 the business of insurance;
 (C)  the applicant has not responded
 affirmatively to any question on the license application that
 indicates the applicant has a criminal conviction or has been
 involved in an administrative action that may disqualify the
 applicant from receiving a license; and
 (D)  the appointing agent, insurer, or health
 maintenance organization will supervise the work of the applicant.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *