E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5565
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4568
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2636
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2636
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2636
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2636
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2636
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2636
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2636
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2068
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3456
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3265
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1160
|
Journal Page: 3264
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3264
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3264
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3220
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1137
|
Journal Page: 3219
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3219
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3219
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 278
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 278
|
House
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|