E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6061
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3506
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1854
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4813
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2884
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#791
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2423
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#704
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1843
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 403
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 403
|
House
|
01/17/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|