Senate | 05/04/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1148 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1548 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Record vote | RV#262 | Journal Page: 1547 |
House | 04/18/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1547 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1547 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1521 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Amended | 1-Gonzlez | Journal Page: 1521 |
House | 04/17/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1521 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1430 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 01/17/2017 | Filed |