Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1117 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Wray (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1117
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 11, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for the Texas Armed Services Scholarship
 Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.9772(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  To receive an initial scholarship under this
 subchapter, a student must:
 (1)  be enrolled in a public or private institution of
 higher education in this state;
 (2)  enroll in and be a member in good standing of a
 Reserve Officers' Training Corps (ROTC) program or another
 undergraduate officer commissioning program such as the United
 States Marine Corps Platoon Leaders Class while enrolled in a
 public or private institution of higher education in this state;
 (3)  be appointed to receive a scholarship by the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, a state senator, or a state
 representative; and
 (4)  enter into an agreement with the board under
 Section 61.9773.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.9773(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  To receive a scholarship under this subchapter, a
 student must enter into an agreement with the board as provided by
 this section.  The agreement must require the student to:
 (1)  complete four years of ROTC training or complete
 another undergraduate officer commissioning program such as the
 United States Marine Corps Platoon Leaders Class;
 (2)  graduate not later than six years after the date
 the student first enrolls in a public or private institution of
 higher education in this state;
 (3)  after graduation, enter into:
 (A)  a four-year commitment to be a member of the
 Texas Army National Guard, Texas Air National Guard, Texas State
 Guard, United States Coast Guard, or United States Merchant Marine;
 or
 (B)  a contract to serve as a commissioned officer
 in any branch of the armed services of the United States;
 (4)  meet the physical examination requirements and all
 other prescreening requirements of the Texas Army National Guard,
 Texas Air National Guard, Texas State Guard, United States Coast
 Guard, or United States Merchant Marine or the branch of the armed
 services with which the student enters into a contract; and
 (5)  agree to repay the scholarship if the student:
 (A)  fails to maintain satisfactory academic
 progress;
 (B)  withdraws from the scholarship program; or
 (C)  fails to fulfill a commitment or contract
 described by Subdivision (3).
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply
 beginning with a Texas Armed Services Scholarship awarded for the
 2017-2018 academic year. A Texas Armed Services Scholarship
 awarded for an academic year before that academic year is covered by
 the law in effect when the scholarship was awarded, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 shall adopt rules for the administration of Sections 61.9772 and
 61.9773, Education Code, as amended by this Act, as soon as
 practicable after this Act takes effect.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *