House | 05/04/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2466 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 706 | Journal Page: 2466 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1430 | |
House | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation | Journal Page: 692 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 692 | |
House | 02/28/2017 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 493 | |
House | 02/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 493 | |
House | 01/18/2017 | Filed |