Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 19, 2017

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Witness List February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 31, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2017
Bill March 17, 2017