House | 05/01/2017 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 2133 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Point of order sustained | Rule 8, Section 1(c) | Journal Page: 2132 |
House | 05/01/2017 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 2132 |
House | 05/01/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2132 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Postponed | 5/1/17 2:00 PM | Journal Page: 2047 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 2047 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2047 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 01/19/2017 | Filed |