Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1170 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Reynolds, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1170
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 22, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of counties to advertise on personal
 property owned or leased by the county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 263.251(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commissioners court of a county may adopt a
 procedure by which the county may:
 (1)  lease to another entity advertising space located:
 (A)  in or on a building or part of a building
 owned by the county;
 (B)  on personal property [a vehicle] owned by the
 county;
 (C)  on an official county website; or
 (D)  on personal property [a vehicle] leased by
 the county, with the property [vehicle] owner's consent; or
 (2)  sell advertising space located on correspondence
 distributed by the county through the United States Postal Service.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *