House | 05/05/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2690 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Record vote | RV#855 | Journal Page: 2690 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 2690 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(b)(1) | Journal Page: 2689 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2689 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Postponed | 5/5/17 1:42 PM | Journal Page: 2672 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 2672 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Amendment tabled | 2-Stickland | Journal Page: 2671 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Amended | 1-Springer | Journal Page: 2670 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2670 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 406 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 406 | |
House | 01/19/2017 | Filed |