Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1210 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/23/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R5673 AAF-F
 By: Phillips H.B. No. 1210


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to passenger security screening.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.002(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The governing body may commission an employee of an
 airport security force established under this chapter as a peace
 officer, subject to Subchapter G, Chapter 1701, Occupations
 [Subchapter C, Chapter 415, Government] Code, if the employee gives
 an oath and a bond for the faithful performance of the employee's
 duties as required by the governing body.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 23, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Sections 23.004 and 23.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 23.004.  ANALYSIS AND REPORT REGARDING PASSENGER
 SECURITY SCREENINGS. (a) In this section, "airport operator"
 means:
 (1)  a local government that owns or controls an
 airport; or
 (2)  a person who operates, as the agent of a local
 government or otherwise, an airport owned or controlled by the
 local government.
 (b)  An airport operator shall establish a program to collect
 complaints received by the operator regarding passenger security
 screenings. Complaints collected under this section are
 confidential and not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552,
 Government Code.
 (c)  Not later than October 1 of each year, and in a manner
 prescribed by the director of Texas homeland security, an airport
 operator shall submit to the executive director of the Texas
 Department of Transportation and the director of Texas homeland
 security an analysis of complaints regarding passenger security
 screenings received during the most recent state fiscal year. The
 analysis must identify the general categories of complaints
 regarding passenger security screenings and provide trend data on
 the frequency of those complaints. The analysis may not contain any
 personal passenger information that would compromise a passenger's
 privacy or safety.
 (d)  Not later than December 1 of each year, the director of
 Texas homeland security shall submit a report to the congressional
 delegation of this state. The report must provide an analysis of
 complaints regarding passenger security screenings in this state
 and make recommendations regarding ways in which to conduct
 effective passenger security screenings while minimizing
 unnecessary impositions on airline travelers' time and privacy.
 (e)  This section expires January 1, 2023.
 Sec. 23.005.  SCREENING PARTNERSHIP PROGRAM.  (a) In this
 section, "airport operator" has the meaning assigned by Section
 23.004.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2018, an airport operator
 shall apply to the Under Secretary of Transportation for Security
 under 49 U.S.C. Section 44920 to participate in the security
 screening opt-out program.
 (c)  The airport operator shall submit the following
 information to the executive director of the Texas Department of
 Transportation and the director of Texas homeland security:
 (1)  not later than the 30th day after the date an
 application was submitted under Subsection (b), a letter confirming
 the submission of an application;
 (2)  not later than the 30th day after receiving the
 notice, a copy of the notice of the disposition of the application;
 and
 (3)  not later than January 31, 2023, a written
 statement regarding any failure to receive a notice of the
 disposition of the application.
 (d)  This section expires August 31, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the director of Texas homeland security shall
 prescribe procedures to implement the change in law made by Section
 23.004, Transportation Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  (a) Sections 23.004(c) and (d), Transportation
 Code, as added by this Act, take effect January 1, 2018.
 (b)  Except as otherwise provided by Subsection (a) of this
 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017.