E | 05/26/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/26/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5684 | |
E | 05/18/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3890 | |
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2053 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3663 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3665 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3487 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1258 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1258 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 937 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1431 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1127 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#155 | Journal Page: 1127 |
House | 04/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1127 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1127 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1099 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1099 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 866 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 423 | |
House | 02/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 423 | |
House | 01/23/2017 | Filed |