E
|
05/29/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
E
|
05/25/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2963
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4565
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1693
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3026
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2789
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#913
|
Journal Page: 2789
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2789
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2789
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2699
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2699
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 484
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 484
|
House
|
01/24/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|