Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1254 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Wray (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1254
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 23, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 23, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating July 26 as Waxahachie Chautauqua Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.065 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.065.  WAXAHACHIE CHAUTAUQUA DAY. (a) July 26 is
 Waxahachie Chautauqua Day in recognition of the Waxahachie
 Chautauqua auditorium and to promote the history of Chautauqua, the
 role Chautauqua plays in preserving communities, and the
 educational and cultural opportunities Chautauqua offers through
 community programs.
 (b)  Waxahachie Chautauqua Day shall be regularly observed
 by appropriate programs and activities.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *