E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6066
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5565
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4569
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2634
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2634
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2634
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2634
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2634
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2634
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2634
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2088
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#528
|
Journal Page: 2087
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2087
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2087
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2033
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2033
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2033
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1424
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
House
|
01/25/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|