E
|
05/29/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
E
|
05/24/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5095
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3988
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1455
|
Journal Page: 3988
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3988
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3886
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1770
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3238
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1069
|
Journal Page: 3101
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3101
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3101
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Clardy
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 280
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 280
|
House
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|