Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1296 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Frullo, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 1296
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
3- May 16, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
4- Commerce; May 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 1296
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to health benefit coverage for prescription drug
126 synchronization.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Chapter 1369, Insurance Code, is amended by
159 adding Subchapter J to read as follows:
1610 SUBCHAPTER J. COVERAGE RELATED TO PRESCRIPTION DRUG
1711 SYNCHRONIZATION
1812 Sec. 1369.451. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
1913 (1) "Cost-sharing amount" includes an amount charged
2014 for a deductible, coinsurance, or copayment.
2115 (2) "Health care provider" means a person who provides
2216 health care services under a license, certificate, registration, or
2317 other similar evidence of regulation issued by this or another
2418 state of the United States.
2519 (3) "Physician" means an individual licensed to
2620 practice medicine in this or another state of the United States.
2721 Sec. 1369.452. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. (a) This
2822 subchapter applies only to a health benefit plan that provides
2923 benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a
3024 health condition, accident, or sickness, including an individual,
3125 group, blanket, or franchise insurance policy or insurance
3226 agreement, a group hospital service contract, or an individual or
3327 group evidence of coverage or similar coverage document that is
3428 offered by:
3529 (1) an insurance company;
3630 (2) a group hospital service corporation operating
3731 under Chapter 842;
3832 (3) a health maintenance organization operating under
3933 Chapter 843;
4034 (4) an approved nonprofit health corporation that
4135 holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844;
4236 (5) a multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds
4337 a certificate of authority under Chapter 846;
4438 (6) a stipulated premium company operating under
4539 Chapter 884;
4640 (7) a fraternal benefit society operating under
4741 Chapter 885; or
4842 (8) an exchange operating under Chapter 942.
4943 (b) This subchapter applies to group health coverage made
5044 available by a school district in accordance with Section 22.004,
5145 Education Code.
5246 (c) Notwithstanding any provision in Chapter 1551, 1575,
5347 1579, or 1601 or any other law, this subchapter applies to health
5448 benefit plan coverage provided under:
5549 (1) Chapter 1551;
5650 (2) Chapter 1575;
5751 (3) Chapter 1579; and
5852 (4) Chapter 1601.
5953 (d) Notwithstanding Section 1501.251 or any other law, this
6054 subchapter applies to coverage under a small employer health
6155 benefit plan subject to Chapter 1501.
6256 (e) This subchapter applies to a standard health benefit
6357 plan issued under Chapter 1507.
6458 (f) To the extent allowed by federal law, the child health
6559 plan program operated under Chapter 62, Health and Safety Code, and
6660 the state Medicaid program, including the Medicaid managed care
6761 program operated under Chapter 533, Government Code, shall provide
6862 the coverage required under this subchapter to a recipient.
6963 Sec. 1369.453. APPLICABILITY TO CERTAIN MEDICATIONS. This
7064 subchapter applies with respect to only a medication that:
7165 (1) is covered by the enrollee's health benefit plan;
7266 (2) meets the prior authorization criteria
7367 specifically applicable to the medication under the health benefit
7468 plan on the date the request for synchronization is made;
7569 (3) is used for treatment and management of a chronic
7670 illness, as that term is defined by Section 1369.456;
7771 (4) may be prescribed with refills;
7872 (5) is a formulation that can be effectively dispensed
7973 in accordance with the medication synchronization plan described by
8074 Section 1369.456; and
8175 (6) is not, according to the schedules established by
8276 the commissioner of the Department of State Health Services under
8377 Chapter 481, Health and Safety Code:
8478 (A) a Schedule II controlled substance; or
8579 (B) a Schedule III controlled substance
8680 containing hydrocodone.
8781 Sec. 1369.454. PRORATION OF COST-SHARING AMOUNT REQUIRED.
8882 (a) A health benefit plan that provides benefits for prescription
8983 drugs shall prorate any cost-sharing amount charged for a partial
9084 supply of a prescription drug if:
9185 (1) the pharmacy or the enrollee's prescribing
9286 physician or health care provider notifies the health benefit plan
9387 that:
9488 (A) the quantity dispensed is to synchronize the
9589 dates that the pharmacy dispenses the enrollee's prescription
9690 drugs; and
9791 (B) the synchronization of the dates is in the
9892 best interest of the enrollee; and
9993 (2) the enrollee agrees to the synchronization.
10094 (b) The proration described by Subsection (a) must be based
10195 on the number of days' supply of the drug actually dispensed.
10296 Sec. 1369.455. PRORATION OF DISPENSING FEE PROHIBITED. A
10397 health benefit plan that prorates a cost-sharing amount as required
10498 by Section 1369.454 may not prorate the fee paid to the pharmacy for
10599 dispensing the drug for which the cost-sharing amount was prorated.
106100 Sec. 1369.456. IMPLEMENTATION OF CERTAIN MEDICATION
107101 SYNCHRONIZATION PLANS. (a) For the purposes of this section:
108102 (1) "Chronic illness" means an illness or physical
109103 condition that may be:
110104 (A) reasonably expected to continue for an
111105 uninterrupted period of at least three months; and
112106 (B) controlled but not cured by medical
113107 treatment.
114108 (2) "Medication synchronization plan" means a plan
115109 established for the purpose of synchronizing the filling or
116110 refilling of multiple prescriptions.
117111 (b) A health benefit plan shall establish a process through
118112 which the following parties may jointly approve a medication
119113 synchronization plan for medication to treat an enrollee's chronic
120114 illness:
121115 (1) the health benefit plan;
122116 (2) the enrollee;
123117 (3) the prescribing physician or health care provider;
124118 and
125119 (4) a pharmacist.
126120 (c) A health benefit plan shall provide coverage for a
127121 medication dispensed in accordance with the dates established in
128122 the medication synchronization plan described by Subsection (b).
129123 (d) A health benefit plan shall establish a process that
130124 allows a pharmacist or pharmacy to override the health benefit
131125 plan's denial of coverage for a medication described by Subsection
132126 (b).
133127 (e) A health benefit plan shall allow a pharmacist or
134128 pharmacy to override the health benefit plan's denial of coverage
135129 through the process described by Subsection (d), and the health
136130 benefit plan shall provide coverage for the medication if:
137131 (1) the prescription for the medication is being
138132 refilled in accordance with the medication synchronization plan
139133 described by Subsection (b); and
140134 (2) the reason for the denial is that the prescription
141135 is being refilled before the date established by the plan's general
142136 prescription refill guidelines.
143137 SECTION 2. This Act applies only to a health benefit plan
144138 that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after
145139 January 1, 2018. A health benefit plan delivered, issued for
146140 delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2018, is governed by the law
147141 as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
148142 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
149143 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
150- * * * * *
144+ ______________________________ ______________________________
145+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
146+ I certify that H.B. No. 1296 was passed by the House on May 3,
147+ 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 12, 1 present, not
148+ voting.
149+ ______________________________
150+ Chief Clerk of the House
151+ I certify that H.B. No. 1296 was passed by the Senate on May
152+ 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
153+ ______________________________
154+ Secretary of the Senate
155+ APPROVED: _____________________
156+ Date
157+ _____________________
158+ Governor