Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2068
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3426
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1237
|
Journal Page: 3425
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3425
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3425
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3363
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3363
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1194
|
Journal Page: 3362
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amended
|
6-Guillen
|
Journal Page: 3361
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
4-Springer
|
Journal Page: 3356
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3356
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/11/17 6:47 PM
|
Journal Page: 3334
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 6
|
Journal Page: 3334
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
4-Springer
|
Journal Page: 3330
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3316
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
House
|
01/26/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|