Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1303 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2017

                    By: Stephenson (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1303
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 71 in
 Wharton County as the Roy P. Benavidez Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  ROY P. BENAVIDEZ MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)  The
 portion of State Highway 71 in Wharton County between its
 intersection with the Colorado County line and Farm-to-Market Road
 2765 is designated as the Roy P. Benavidez Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Roy P. Benavidez Memorial Highway and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *