Senate | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 842 | |
House | 03/31/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1068 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 959 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Record vote | RV#133 | Journal Page: 958 |
House | 03/30/2017 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 958 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Amended | 1-Miller | Journal Page: 958 |
House | 03/30/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 958 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 923 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Record vote | RV#120 | Journal Page: 922 |
House | 03/29/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 922 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 922 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 640 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 280 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 280 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |