House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2282
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1451
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 280
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 280
|
House
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|