Senate | 05/01/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1531 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1531 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1233 | |
House | 04/21/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1804 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | RV#325 | Journal Page: 1717 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Amended | 1-Pickett and Leach | Journal Page: 1717 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | RV#300 | Journal Page: 1629 |
House | 04/19/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Amended | 4-Schofield | Journal Page: 1628 |
House | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1627 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 485 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 485 | |
House | 01/30/2017 | Filed |