House | 05/03/2017 | Postponed | 5/12/17 7:00 AM | Journal Page: 2452 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2452 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1430 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 494 | |
House | 02/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 494 | |
House | 01/30/2017 | Filed |