Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1378 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Davis of Harris, Button H.B. No. 1378
 (Senate Sponsor - Hughes)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2017;
 May 15, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restrictions on political contributions and political
 expenditures by general-purpose political committees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 253.037, Election Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *