Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1196 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | RV#279 | Journal Page: 1580 |
House | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1580 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1580 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1560 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1560 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Placed on Emergency Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1111 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2017 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 495 | |
House | 02/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 495 | |
House | 01/31/2017 | Filed |