E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/25/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2963
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4565
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2234
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2234
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2234
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2234
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2234
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2234
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2234
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#769
|
Journal Page: 2556
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2556
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2556
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#700
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2017
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 496
|
House
|
02/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 496
|
House
|
02/01/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|