Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1433 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Vo (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1433
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 April 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 4, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 4, 2017, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the statute of limitations applicable to the collection
 of a contribution, a penalty, or interest under the Texas
 Unemployment Compensation Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 213.033(b) and (c), Labor Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The following actions suspend the running of the
 limitations period prescribed under Subsection (a):
 (1)  an administrative hearing to redetermine the
 liability for a contribution, a penalty, or interest pending before
 the commission; [and]
 (2)  a judicial proceeding to redetermine the liability
 for a contribution, a penalty, or interest pending in a court of
 competent jurisdiction; and
 (3) [(2)]  a bankruptcy case begun under Title 11 of
 the United States Code pending before the court.
 (c)  After a hearing, proceeding, or case described by
 Subsection (b) is closed, the running of the limitations period
 prescribed under Subsection (a) resumes.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *