E
|
05/29/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
E
|
05/24/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5095
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3985
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3985
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1453
|
Journal Page: 3985
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3985
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3745
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2081
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2081
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2081
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2080
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2080
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2080
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Nelson
|
Journal Page: 2080
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2080
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2080
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2080
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1640
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#689
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 10
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
8-Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Simmons and Collier
|
Journal Page: 2363
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2363
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2292
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2292
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amended
|
2-Simmons
|
Journal Page: 2292
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Simmons
|
Journal Page: 2292
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 8, Section 10
|
Journal Page: 2292
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Simmons
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/2/17 5:27 PM
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 1(a)
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 686
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 686
|
House
|
02/01/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|