Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1449 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Simmons, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 1449
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1;
 May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1449 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting local governments from imposing certain
 fees on new construction.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The legislature finds that:
 (1)  fees and exactions imposed by political
 subdivisions to fund subsidized housing materially increase the
 cost of housing construction and other forms of construction in the
 state; and
 (2)  it is in the state's interest to incentivize
 housing affordability for Texas residents by circumscribing
 regulatory burdens imposed on the housing industry by political
 subdivisions.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 250, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 250.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 250.008.  LINKAGE FEES PROHIBITED. (a) A political
 subdivision may not adopt or enforce a charter provision,
 ordinance, order, or other regulation that imposes, directly or
 indirectly, a fee on new construction for the purposes of
 offsetting the cost or rent of any unit of residential housing.
 (b)  For purposes of this section:
 (1)  a fee is imposed indirectly on new construction if
 a charter provision, ordinance, order, or other regulation allows
 acceptance by the political subdivision of a fee on new
 construction; and
 (2)  new construction includes zoning, subdivisions,
 site plans, and building permits associated with new construction.
 (c)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  an affordable housing and property tax abatement
 program:
 (A)  in existence on January 1, 2017;
 (B)  adopted under Chapter 378 by a municipality
 with a population of more than 700,000; and
 (C)  for which eligibility is maintained as
 required under Chapter 312, Tax Code; or
 (2)  an ordinance, order, or other similar measure in
 effect on January 1, 2017, that allows voluntary payment of a fee to
 a political subdivision in connection with the issuance of a zoning
 waiver related to new construction that allows a multifamily
 residential or commercial structure to exceed height or square
 footage limitations.
 (d)  A charter provision, ordinance, order, or other
 regulation adopted by a political subdivision that conflicts with
 this section is null and void.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act does not apply
 to an agreement relating to providing subsidized housing entered
 into before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *