Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1456 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 1456
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to judicial review of certain decisions under the Texas
 Workers' Compensation Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 415.035, Labor Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 415.035.  JUDICIAL REVIEW. [(a)] A decision under
 Section 415.034 is subject to judicial review in the manner
 provided for judicial review under Chapter 2001, Government Code.
 [(b)     If an administrative penalty is assessed, the person
 charged shall:
 [(1)     forward the amount of the penalty to the division
 for deposit in an escrow account; or
 [(2)     post with the division a bond for the amount of
 the penalty, effective until all judicial review of the
 determination is final.
 [(c)     Failure to comply with Subsection (b) results in a
 waiver of all legal rights to contest the violation or the amount of
 the penalty.
 [(d)     If the court determines that the penalty should not
 have been assessed or reduces the amount of the penalty, the
 division shall:
 [(1)     remit the appropriate amount, plus accrued
 interest, if the administrative penalty was paid; or
 [(2)  release the bond.]
 SECTION 2.  Section 415.035, Labor Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies only to judicial review of a decision issued on or
 after the effective date of this Act. Judicial review of a decision
 issued before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect on the date the decision was issued, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *