E
|
06/15/2017
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5565
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2968
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4737
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1796
|
Journal Page: 4738
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4737
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4363
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1566
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1566
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#326
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 621
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 621
|
House
|
02/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|