Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1494 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Morrison (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1494
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 18, 2017, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2, 1 present not voting;
 May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by
 certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 351, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 351.1075 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.1075.  ALLOCATION OF REVENUE FOR THE ARTS BY
 CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES. (a) This section applies only to a
 municipality:
 (1)  a portion of which is designated as a cultural arts
 district; and
 (2)  that is the county seat of a county:
 (A)  described by Section 352.002(a)(6);
 (B)  with a population of less than 50,000; and
 (C)  that includes a state park and a national
 wildlife refuge.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter and
 subject to Subsection (c)(1), a municipality to which this section
 applies may use not more than 30 percent of the revenue derived from
 the municipal hotel occupancy tax for the purposes provided by
 Section 351.101(a)(4).
 (c)  A municipality to which this section applies that spends
 more than 15 percent of the hotel occupancy tax revenue collected by
 the municipality in a fiscal year for the purposes provided by
 Section 351.101(a)(4):
 (1)  may not in that fiscal year reduce the percentage
 of hotel occupancy tax revenue that the municipality spends for the
 purposes described by Section 351.101(a)(3) to a percentage that is
 less than the average percentage of hotel occupancy tax revenue
 spent by the municipality for those purposes during the 36-month
 period preceding that fiscal year; and
 (2)  shall determine for that fiscal year:
 (A)  the increase in the amount of hotel revenue
 that is attributable to that expenditure; and
 (B)  the total amount of hotel occupancy tax
 revenue spent by the municipality for the purposes provided by
 Section 351.101(a)(4).
 (d)  If the amount of money determined under Subsection
 (c)(2)(A) is less than the amount of money determined under
 Subsection (c)(2)(B), the municipality shall reimburse the
 municipality's hotel occupancy tax revenue fund from the
 municipality's general fund an amount equal to 50 percent of the
 difference between those determined amounts.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *