Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1503 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Frullo, Thompson of Harris, Wray H.B. No. 1503
 (Senate Sponsor - Huffman)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting of attempted child abductions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 63.0041, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 63.0041.  REPORTING OF ATTEMPTED CHILD ABDUCTION.  (a)
 A local law enforcement agency, on receiving a report of an
 attempted child abduction, shall as soon as practicable, but not
 later than eight hours after receiving the report, provide any
 relevant information regarding the attempted child abduction to the
 clearinghouse.  Information not immediately available shall be
 obtained by the agency and entered into the clearinghouse as a
 supplement to the original entry as soon as possible.
 (b)  A law enforcement officer or local law enforcement
 agency reporting an attempted child abduction to the clearinghouse
 shall make the report by use of the Texas Law Enforcement
 Telecommunications System or a successor system of
 telecommunication used by law enforcement agencies and operated by
 the Department of Public Safety.
 SECTION 2.  Article 63.009(a-3), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *