E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6061
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3535
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5341
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1914
|
Journal Page: 5342
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5341
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4820
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2573
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1566
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1566
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#243
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1424
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
House
|
02/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|