Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1510 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Isaac (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1510
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
3- May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported
5- favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2017,
6- sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 1510
82
93
10- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
114 AN ACT
125 relating to the transfer of certain functions related to emergency
136 services districts from the Department of Agriculture to the Texas
147 Division of Emergency Management.
158 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
169 SECTION 1. Section 487.061, Government Code, is transferred
1710 to Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, redesignated as
1811 Section 418.053, Government Code, and amended to read as follows:
1912 Sec. 418.053 [487.061]. EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT
2013 PROGRAM. (a) The division [department] shall serve as a resource
2114 to provide interested rural communities with:
2215 (1) general information about emergency services
2316 districts; and
2417 (2) information and training related to the
2518 establishment of an emergency services district.
2619 (b) The division [department] may:
2720 (1) provide to fire departments in rural areas
2821 information relating to assistance programs offered to rural
2922 volunteer firefighters, including the federal Staffing for
3023 Adequate Fire and Emergency Response grant program to help fire
3124 departments increase staffing and deployment capabilities; and
3225 (2) provide to rural homeowners information relating
3326 to the benefits of volunteer fire departments, including a
3427 reduction in homeowners insurance risk ratings, lower homeowners
3528 insurance rates, and better fire protection.
3629 SECTION 2. Sections 775.083(a), (b), and (c), Health and
3730 Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
3831 (a) On or before January 1 of each year, a district shall
3932 file with the Texas Division of Emergency Management [Department of
4033 Rural Affairs] an annual report that includes the following:
4134 (1) the district's name;
4235 (2) the name of each county in which the district is
4336 located;
4437 (3) the district's business address;
4538 (4) the name, mailing address, and term of office of
4639 each commissioner;
4740 (5) the name, mailing address, and term of office of
4841 the district's general manager, executive director, and fire chief;
4942 (6) the name of each legal counsel or other consultant
5043 for the district; and
5144 (7) the district's annual budget and tax rate for the
5245 preceding fiscal year.
5346 (b) The Texas Division of Emergency Management [Department
5447 of Rural Affairs] may not charge a fee for filing the report.
5548 (c) The Texas Division of Emergency Management [Department
5649 of Rural Affairs] shall develop and maintain an Internet-based
5750 system that enables:
5851 (1) a district to securely file the report and update
5952 the district's information; and
6053 (2) the public to view, in a searchable format, the
6154 reports filed by districts under this section.
6255 SECTION 3. Not later than January 1, 2018, the following are
6356 transferred from the Department of Agriculture to the Texas
6457 Division of Emergency Management:
6558 (1) the powers, duties, functions, programs, and
6659 activities of the Department of Agriculture relating to the duties
6760 described by Section 418.053, Government Code, as transferred,
6861 redesignated, and amended by this Act;
6962 (2) any obligations and contracts of the Department of
7063 Agriculture that are directly related to implementing a power,
7164 duty, function, program, or activity described by Subdivision (1)
7265 of this section; and
7366 (3) all property and records in the custody of the
7467 Department of Agriculture that are related to a power, duty,
7568 function, program, or activity described by Subdivision (1) of this
7669 section and all funds appropriated by the legislature for that
7770 power, duty, function, program, or activity.
7871 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act to Section
7972 775.083, Health and Safety Code, applies only to an annual report
8073 due on or after January 1, 2019. An annual report due before
8174 January 1, 2019, is governed by the law as it existed immediately
8275 before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in
8376 effect for that purpose.
8477 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
85- * * * * *
78+ ______________________________ ______________________________
79+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
80+ I certify that H.B. No. 1510 was passed by the House on May 4,
81+ 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not
82+ voting.
83+ ______________________________
84+ Chief Clerk of the House
85+ I certify that H.B. No. 1510 was passed by the Senate on May
86+ 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
87+ ______________________________
88+ Secretary of the Senate
89+ APPROVED: _____________________
90+ Date
91+ _____________________
92+ Governor