House | 04/20/2017 | Motion to reconsider spread on the Journal | Journal Page: 1746 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1746 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | RV#339 | Journal Page: 1745 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1729 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1728 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Amended | 1-Schaefer | Journal Page: 1728 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1728 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1681 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | RV#317 | Journal Page: 1681 |
House | 04/19/2017 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1681 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Postponed | 4/20/17 1:00 PM | Journal Page: 1679 |
House | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 319 | |
House | 02/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 319 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |