1 | | - | By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 1545 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017; |
---|
3 | | - | April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Criminal Justice; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | | - | following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 1545 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to the acceptance of certain high school courses to |
---|
12 | 6 | | satisfy part of the training required to obtain a peace officer |
---|
13 | 7 | | license. |
---|
14 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is |
---|
16 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 1701.1525 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 11 | | Sec. 1701.1525. RULES RELATED TO ACCEPTANCE OF CREDIT HOURS |
---|
18 | 12 | | FOR COMPLETION OF CERTAIN HIGH SCHOOL COURSES. (a) The commission |
---|
19 | 13 | | shall adopt rules that establish a procedure under which credit |
---|
20 | 14 | | hours earned for the successful completion of high school courses |
---|
21 | 15 | | that directly relate to law enforcement can be counted toward the |
---|
22 | 16 | | hours of training required of an applicant for a peace officer |
---|
23 | 17 | | license issued under Section 1701.307. |
---|
24 | 18 | | (b) The rules adopted under this section must require that |
---|
25 | 19 | | an applicant submit to the commission a high school transcript that |
---|
26 | 20 | | indicates the applicant earned an endorsement in the public |
---|
27 | 21 | | services category, as described by Section 28.025(c-1), Education |
---|
28 | 22 | | Code. |
---|
29 | 23 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas |
---|
30 | 24 | | Commission on Law Enforcement shall adopt rules as necessary to |
---|
31 | 25 | | comply with Section 1701.1525, Occupations Code, as added by this |
---|
32 | 26 | | Act. |
---|
33 | 27 | | (b) Section 1701.1525, Occupations Code, as added by this |
---|
34 | 28 | | Act, applies only to an application for a license submitted to the |
---|
35 | 29 | | Texas Commission on Law Enforcement on or after the effective date |
---|
36 | 30 | | of this Act. An application submitted before the effective date of |
---|
37 | 31 | | this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the |
---|
38 | 32 | | application was submitted, and the former law is continued in |
---|
39 | 33 | | effect for that purpose. |
---|
40 | 34 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
41 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 35 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 36 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 37 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1545 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 38 | + | 13, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, 3 present, not |
---|
| 39 | + | voting. |
---|
| 40 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 41 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 42 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1545 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 43 | + | 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3. |
---|
| 44 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 45 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 46 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 47 | + | Date |
---|
| 48 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 49 | + | Governor |
---|