LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB1549
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1549
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1549
Compare Versions
HB1549 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1549 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1549 Enrolled May 29, 2017
HB1549 Comm Sub May 22, 2017
HB1549 Engrossed May 6, 2017
HB1549 Comm Sub April 19, 2017
HB1549 Introduced February 6, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
HB1549 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1549 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1549 Enrolled May 29, 2017
HB1549 Comm Sub May 22, 2017
HB1549 Engrossed May 6, 2017
HB1549 Comm Sub April 19, 2017
HB1549 Introduced February 6, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare