E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4121
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4121
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1954
|
Journal Page: 5674
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5671
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3589
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3589
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3318
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3318
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3318
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5066
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5066
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5066
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4573
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Taylor of Galveston
|
Journal Page: 2703
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2703
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2703
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3238
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3061
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1049
|
Journal Page: 3061
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3061
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3061
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 606
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 606
|
House
|
02/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|