E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3506
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5214
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1877
|
Journal Page: 5215
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5214
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4812
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2959
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2959
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2959
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2959
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2959
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2959
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2959
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Zaffirini
|
Journal Page: 2957
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2957
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2957
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#735
|
Journal Page: 2517
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2517
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2517
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2299
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 386
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 386
|
House
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|