Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2449 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2209 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1770 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3391 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3124 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1091 | Journal Page: 3123 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3123 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Amended | 1-Wilson | Journal Page: 3123 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3123 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3004 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Record vote | RV#1042 | Journal Page: 3003 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3003 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Amended | 1-White | Journal Page: 3002 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3002 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1541 | |
House | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 02/06/2017 | Filed |