House | 04/17/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1541 | |
House | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 02/06/2017 | Filed |