House | 04/27/2017 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1840 | |
House | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 02/06/2017 | Filed |