Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1582 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/06/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R3205 SMT-F
 By: King of Uvalde H.B. No. 1582


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of the requirement that appraisal
 review board members be appointed by the local administrative
 district judge.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 6.41(d-1), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (d-1)  In a county with a population of 350,000 [120,000] or
 more the members of the board are appointed by the local
 administrative district judge under Subchapter D, Chapter 74,
 Government Code, in the county in which the appraisal district is
 established.  All applications submitted to the appraisal district
 or to the appraisal review board from persons seeking appointment
 as a member of the appraisal review board shall be delivered to the
 local administrative district judge.  The appraisal district may
 provide the local administrative district judge with information
 regarding whether an applicant for appointment to or a member of the
 board owes any delinquent ad valorem taxes to a taxing unit
 participating in the appraisal district.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The changes made to Section 6.41, Tax Code,
 by this Act apply only to the appointment of appraisal review board
 members to terms beginning on or after January 1, 2018. This Act
 does not affect the term of an appraisal review board member serving
 on December 31, 2017, if the member was appointed before January 1,
 2018, to a term that began before December 31, 2017, and expires
 December 31, 2018.
 (b)  The changes in law made by this Act to Sections 6.41(i)
 and (j), Tax Code, apply only to an offense committed on or after
 the effective date of this Act. An offense committed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the offense was committed, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose. For purposes of this subsection, an
 offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if any
 element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.