Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1593 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 1593
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the engagement strategies included in a school
 district's family engagement plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 29.168(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The agency shall collaborate with other state agencies,
 including the Health and Human Services Commission, that provide
 services for children from birth through five years of age to
 establish prioritized family engagement strategies to be included
 in a school district's family engagement plan. A parent-teacher
 organization, community group, or faith-based institution may
 submit to the agency recommendations regarding the establishment of
 family engagement strategies, and the agency, in establishing the
 family engagement strategies, shall consider any received
 recommendations. The engagement strategies must [be]:
 (1)  be based on empirical research; [and]
 (2)  be proven to demonstrate significant positive
 short-term and long-term outcomes for early childhood education;
 and
 (3)  include programs and interventions that engage a
 family in supporting a student's learning at home.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *