Senate | 05/09/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1735 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3156 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2895 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Record vote | RV#1006 | Journal Page: 2895 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2895 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2895 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2862 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2862 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2862 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/14/2017 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 305 | |
House | 02/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 305 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |