Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1619 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Shine (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 1619
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2017;
 April 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 4, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 4, 2017, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution and punishment of certain outdoor
 burning violations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 382.018, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (f) and (g) to read as follows:
 (f)  If conduct that violates a rule adopted under this
 section also violates a municipal ordinance, that conduct may be
 prosecuted only under the municipal ordinance, provided that:
 (1)  the violation is not a second or subsequent
 violation of a rule adopted under this section or a municipal
 ordinance; and
 (2)  the violation does not involve the burning of
 heavy oils, asphaltic materials, potentially explosive materials,
 or chemical wastes.
 (g)  Notwithstanding Section 7.002, Water Code, the
 provisions of this section and rules adopted under this section may
 be enforced by a peace officer as described by Article 2.12, Code of
 Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 2.  Section 7.187(b), Water Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 7.177(a)(5), conviction for an
 offense under Section 382.018, Health and Safety Code, is
 punishable as:
 (1)  a Class C misdemeanor if the violation is a first
 violation and does not involve the burning of heavy oils, asphaltic
 materials, potentially explosive materials, or chemical wastes
 [waste is not a substance described by Subdivision (3)];
 (2)  a Class B misdemeanor if the violation is a second
 or subsequent violation and:
 (A)  the violation does not involve the burning
 of:
 (i)  substances described by Subdivision
 (1); or
 (ii)  insulation on electrical wire or
 cable, treated lumber, plastics, non-wood construction or
 demolition materials, furniture, carpet, or items containing
 natural or synthetic rubber; or
 (B)  the violation involves the burning of
 substances described by Paragraph (A)(ii) and none of the prior
 violations involved the burning of substances described by
 Subdivision (1) or Paragraph (A)(ii) [under Subdivision (1)]; or
 (3)  a Class A misdemeanor if the violation:
 (A)  involves the burning of substances described
 by Subdivision (1); or
 (B)  is a second or subsequent violation and
 involves the burning of substances described by Subdivision
 (2)(A)(ii) and one or more of the prior violations involved the
 burning of substances described by Subdivision (1) or (2)(A)(ii)
 [tires, insulation on electrical wire or cable, treated lumber,
 plastics, non-wood construction or demolition materials, heavy
 oils, asphaltic materials, potentially explosive materials,
 furniture, carpet, chemical wastes, or items containing natural or
 synthetic rubber].
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *