Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1630 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Dale (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 1630
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the approval of expenditures for the Texas Military
 Department.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 437, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 437.063 to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.063.  ADJUTANT GENERAL: DELEGATION OF EXPENDITURE
 APPROVAL AUTHORITY. The adjutant general may delegate the authority
 to approve department expenditures to the executive director.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *