Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1771 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3238 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3112 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1080 | Journal Page: 3112 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3112 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3112 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2988 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2988 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1068 | |
House | 03/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 558 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 558 | |
House | 02/07/2017 | Filed |